Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Lomellino del Canto

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1557AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
17 Apr 1562AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
10 Jan 1571AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
9 Aug 1575DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Lomellino del Canto:
Archbishop Giacomo Lomellino del Canto (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013