Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Locatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1567AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
25 Jan 1568Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Sep 1571DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Locatelli
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Locatelli (died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 37
  • c3: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,997
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast