Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1737Born
8 Mar 181678.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Jul 181678.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
28 Jul 181678.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Oct 181779.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere
Antonio Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast