Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Father Simon Li Zhigang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Chengdu [Chengtu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1963³Born
17 Apr 199127.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 201147.6SelectedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
18 Jun 201147.7DiedBishop-Elect of Chengdu [Chengtu], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Li Zhigang
Father Simon Li Zhigang (born Oct 1963, died ) Bishop-Elect of Chengdu [Chengtu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMianyang/Chendgu

  • a priest for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast