Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspare Litago

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornCagliari
24 Apr 164545.3AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
29 Apr 165252.3AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
2 Sep 165454.6SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
26 Jun 165656.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1657¹57.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Litago:
Archbishop Gaspare Litago (born 1600, died 1657) Archbishop of Sassari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 350, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015