Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas de Lisle, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1345AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
24 Jul 1345Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 1361DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas de Lisle:
Bishop Thomas de Lisle O.P. (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b/c2: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 335
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015