Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon zur Lippe

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430²Born
21 Feb 146333.1SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
18 May 146333.4ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Mar 149868.2DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon zur Lippe:
Bishop Simon zur Lippe (died ) Bishop of Paderborn

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013