Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Lintorff, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Havelberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1405¹Born
Sep 142722.6SelectedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
29 Oct 142722.8ConfirmedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
Jul 146055.5ResignedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
Nov 146156.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Havelberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Lintorff (VIAF: 81025353)
Bishop Konrad von Lintorff O. Praem. (born 1405, died Nov 1461) Bishop Emeritus of Havelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast