Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Xaver Linsenmann

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Rottenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1835Born
10 Aug 185923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
20 Jul 189862.6SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
5 Sep 189862.7ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
21 Sep 189862.8DiedBishop-Elect of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Linsenmann (VIAF: 22268977)
Father Franz Xaver Linsenmann (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Rottenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRottweil

  • a priest for 39.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 487
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast