Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Lincoln

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1706¹Born
1730²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
19 Nov 175549.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Nov 175549.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Nov 175549.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aradus
11 Jan 175650.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aradus
21 Jun 175751.4SucceededArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
18 Jun 176357.4DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Lincoln
Archbishop Richard Lincoln (born 1706, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceHome, Smithfield
Buried Place (Original)Family plot, St. James' churchyard

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 94, and Page 201
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,993
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast