Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Lichtenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1354AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
9 Mar 1354Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Sep 1365DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Lichtenberg
Bishop Jean de Lichtenberg (died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 105
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast