Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Napoléon François Libois, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong), China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1805Born
18 Sep 183024.7Ordained PriestPriest
1836²30.0ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 May 184842.4AppointedPrefect of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong), China
Oct 1853³47.7ResignedPrefect of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong), China
6 Apr 187266.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong), China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Napoléon François Libois
Father Napoléon François Libois M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambois, Diocese of Sées {Séez}, France
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast