Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Esther Le Turdu, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1826BornQuintin, France
16 Mar 185023.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1 Mar 187144.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
1 Mar 187144.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
6 Mar 187144.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
14 May 187144.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
10 May 187750.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

MicroData Summary for Michel-Esther Le Turdu:
Bishop Michel-Esther Le Turdu M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013