Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Leccavella, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1542AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
14 May 1542³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
16 Dec 1562AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
1565¹ResignedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
10 Nov 1566DiedBishop Emeritus of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Leccavella
Archbishop Sebastiano Leccavella O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227, and Page 254
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast