Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father (Jean-Marie-) Joseph Lebeau, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1870Born
4 Oct 189121.1ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Feb 189524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
18 Dec 193363.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
193766.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
15 May 194372.8DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for (Jean-Marie-) Joseph Lebeau
Father (Jean-Marie-) Joseph Lebeau M.S.C. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeraing, Belgium
Death PlaceAbaiang, Vicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati

  • a priest for 48.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast