Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cherubino Lavosio, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
19 Aug 156669.6AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
8 Sep 156669.6Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
23 Apr 157780.3DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cherubino Lavosio
Bishop Cherubino Lavosio O.S.A. (born 1497, died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtri, Diocese of Penne e Atri
Ordained BishopS. Tryphone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCassia, Diocese of Norcia

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 18
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast