Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Ferratini (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534²Born
9 Oct 156228.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
17 Dec 157137.9ResignedBishop of Amelia, Italy
11 Sep 160672.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Nov 160672.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ferratini (Jr.)
Bartolomeo Cardinal Ferratini (Jr.) (born 1534, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmelia, Diocese of Amelia
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Amelia, Diocese of Amelia

  • a cardinal for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast