Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Lauro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527¹Born
12 Oct 156538.7AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
7 Oct 158356.7AppointedBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
27 Nov 158558.9AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
1588¹61.0DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Lauro
Bishop Bernardo Lauro O.P. (born 1527, died 1588) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291, and Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast