Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dionisio Neagrus Cardinal Laurerio, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urbino, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
27 Apr 153538.3AppointedPrior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Dec 153942.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 154043.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
13 Feb 154043.1AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
May 1542³45.3ResignedPrior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
17 Sep 154245.7DiedBishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Neagrus Laurerio
Dionisio Neagrus Cardinal Laurerio O.S.M. (born 1497, died ) Bishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 2.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 5*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast