Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simeon Lascaris

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
1660¹SelectedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
6 Sep 1660ConfirmedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
19 Jul 1689DiedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Simeon Lascaris
Archbishop Simeon Lascaris (died ) Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 60
  • obd/d: CB, 8 Sep 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast