Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Lascaris de Tenda

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466²Born
12 Jan 152357.0AppointedBishop of Riez, France
3 May 152357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
11 Apr 152660.2DiedBishop of Riez, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas Lascaris de Tenda
Bishop Thomas Lascaris de Tenda (born 1466, died ) Bishop of Riez

  • a bishop for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,523, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast