Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Lasagni

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1814BornCarprarola, Italy
17 Dec 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 188066.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
27 Mar 188267.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 188267.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
19 Apr 188570.8DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Pietro Lasagni:
Cardinal Pietro Lasagni (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Dec 1880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013