Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Langton

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1296AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 1296Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 1321DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Langton:
Bishop Walter Langton (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 207
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013