Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Langeac

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1526AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
17 Apr 1532AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
25 Jul 1541DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Langeac (VIAF: 170706110)
Bishop Jean de Langeac (died ) Bishop of Limoges

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222, and Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,526, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast