Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alphonse-Hubert Cardinal de Latier de Bayane

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1739BornValence, France
23 Feb 180161.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
9 Aug 180262.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Aug 180262.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
27 Jul 181878.7DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Hubert de Latier de Bayane:
Cardinal Alphonse-Hubert de Latier de Bayane (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 17.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013