Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto von Kulm, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1323AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Jan 1324Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
15 Feb 1348DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Otto von Kulm
Bishop Otto von Kulm O.T. (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 24.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 217
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,968

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast