Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Kropidło

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360¹Born
9 Jun 138222.4ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
1384²24.0AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Mar 138929.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Jan 139434.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Poznań, Poland
31 Jul 139434.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kammin (Camin), Germany
26 Apr 139838.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
27 Jan 140242.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
3 Mar 142161.2DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kropidło:
Archbishop Jan Kropidło (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 408, and Page 534
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 265, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013