Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grégoire Joseph Koudsi

Deceased

Archbishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1740BornAlep
31 Jul 177131.4AppointedArchbishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Lebanon
21 Aug 179757.5DiedArchbishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Joseph Koudsi:
Archbishop Grégoire Joseph Koudsi (born , died ) Archbishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015