Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Kite (Kyte)

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1513AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
12 Jul 1521AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 1521AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
19 Jun 1537DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Kite (Kyte)
Archbishop John Kite (Kyte) (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 240
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 May 2018

Quantcast