Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edwin Roy Kinch, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Ingwavuma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1918BornWindthorst, Canada
19 Sep 193719.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
13 Sep 194224.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
20 May 194526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
13 Nov 196244.2AppointedPrefect of Ingwavuma, South Africa
9 May 197051.7ResignedPrefect of Ingwavuma, South Africa
26 May 200384.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Ingwavuma, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Edwin Roy Kinch:
Father Edwin Roy Kinch O.S.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Ingwavuma

  • a priest for 58.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016