Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gabriel Kihimbare

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kitega, Burundi

Titular Bishop of Cabarsussi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1925Born
3 Apr 195631.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 196439.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kitega, Burundi
29 Sep 196439.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
15 Dec 196439.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kitega, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Kihimbare
Father Gabriel Kihimbare (born 1925, died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Kitega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuguerero

  • a priest for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast