Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Isidore Cardinal of Kiev

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sant’Alessio

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Administrator of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1385¹BornMonembasia, Greece
1437¹52.0AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Dec 143955.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144055.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
1442¹57.0ResignedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ruthenian), Ukraine
7 Feb 145166.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
10 Jun 145166.4AppointedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
15 Mar 145570.2ResignedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
10 May 145671.4AppointedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
4 Jan 145873.0ConfirmedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
20 Apr 145873.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
27 Apr 146378.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidore of Kiev:
Cardinal Isidore of Kiev (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sant’Alessio

  • a cardinal for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013