Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Kiełbasa

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Bishop of Pomesania (Pomezania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1425¹Born
1 Apr 146742.2AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Apr 146742.2AppointedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
18 Apr 146742.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Nov 147954.8DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Kiełbasa
Bishop Wincenty Kiełbasa (born 1425, died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte. Lucie, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLubawa

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 140, and Page 218
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1467, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast