Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernard Georg Kellermann

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1776BornFreckenhorst
2 Aug 180225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
10 Dec 184670.2SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
28 Mar 184770.5ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
29 Mar 184770.5DiedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernard Georg Kellermann:
Priest Bernard Georg Kellermann (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Münster

  • a priest for 44.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013