Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Krizosztom (Ferenc) Kelemen, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Pannonhalma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1884BornHahót
1903²18.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1910²25.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Mar 193349.1AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
7 Nov 195066.8DiedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Krizosztom (Ferenc) Kelemen
Abbot Krizosztom (Ferenc) Kelemen O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

  • a priest for 40.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016