Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alfred Louis Keiling, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Cubango in Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1868Born
30 Nov 189325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Nov 190941.0AppointedPrefect of Upper Cimbebasia {Cimbebasia Superiore}, Angola
30 Nov 193769.0DiedPrefect of Cubango in Angola

MicroData Summary for Alfred Louis Keiling
Father Alfred Louis Keiling C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect of Cubango in Angola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort-Louis, France

  • a priest for 44.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast