Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dietrich Kagelwit, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1300¹BornStendal
18 Dec 134646.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brandenburg, Germany
18 Dec 134646.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
1347²47.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
23 May 135151.3AppointedBishop of Schleswig, Germany
20 Feb 135353.1AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
18 Jun 136161.4AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
16 Dec 136767.9DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich Kagelwit (VIAF: 160103034)
Archbishop Dietrich Kagelwit O. Cist. (born 1300, died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342, and Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 455, and Page 435
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,771
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016