Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Gómez Barroso

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1326AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
Aug 1341³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
14 Jul 1348DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gómez Barroso
Pedro Cardinal Gómez Barroso (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo

  • a cardinal for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast