Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Giustiniani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
13 Oct 156848.7AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
1578¹58.0ResignedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
22 Feb 159676.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Giustiniani
Bishop Angelo Giustiniani O.F.M. Obs. (born 1520, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChio
Death PlaceGeneva, Diocese of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 14*
  • b: Treccani.it, 1 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 3 Nov 2017