Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honorato Juan

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1507Born
1559²51.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 156457.1AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
Apr 1564³57.2Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
30 Jul 156659.5DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Honorato Juan (VIAF: 153118576)
Bishop Honorato Juan (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceBurgo de Osma, Diocese of Osma

  • a priest for 7.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,388
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 74, Number 438
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast