Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Honoré Joseph Marie Jouneaux, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Pala, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1911Born
1929²17.5First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1934²22.5Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1935²23.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
195745.5AppointedPrefect of Pala, Chad
196452.5ResignedPrefect of Pala, Chad
12 Jan 199381.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Pala, Chad

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Honoré Joseph Marie Jouneaux
Father Honoré Joseph Marie Jouneaux O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Pala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaden, France
Death PlacePala, Diocese of Pala

  • a priest for 58.0 years

Source(s):
  • mi/by: CB, 13 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast