Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Jorio

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1867BornVilla San Stefano
17 Sep 189123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 Jan 192860.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
16 Dec 193568.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193568.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
20 Dec 193568.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
18 Feb 194678.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
21 Oct 195487.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Domenico Jorio:
Domenico Cardinal Jorio (born , died ) Prefect of Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014