Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Athanase IV Jaouhar (Jawhar)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1733BornDamascus
1759¹25.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 175925.8SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
31 Jul 175925.8Ordained BishopBishop
13 Feb 176430.4AppointedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Apr 178854.5SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
5 May 178854.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
5 May 178854.6AppointedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
2 Dec 179461.2DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Athanase IV Jaouhar (Jawhar):
Patriarch Athanase IV Jaouhar (Jawhar) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015