Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Ivorra

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornLérida
20 Nov 161742.8AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
11 Mar 161843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
5 May 161843.3DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Ivorra:
Bishop Ramón Ivorra (died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,848
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 136, Number 869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015