Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano P. Israelian

Deceased

Bishop of Karput (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1866BornMusc
1 Nov 189024.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 189933.0AppointedBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
14 May 189933.2Ordained BishopBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
Jun 1915³49.3DiedBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano P. Israelian:
Bishop Stefano P. Israelian (born ) Bishop of Karput

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013