Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Isolani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360²Born
18 Nov 141353.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
18 Nov 141353.8Elevated to Cardinal
1420²60.0AppointedAdministrator of Melfi, Italy
24 Jan 142565.0ResignedAdministrator of Melfi, Italy
9 Feb 143171.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Isolani
Giacomo Cardinal Isolani (born 1360, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Nov 1413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast