Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Isla y Mena

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618BornUrena
4 Apr 167254.3SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
8 Aug 167254.6ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Oct 167254.8Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
17 Dec 168164.0DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Isla y Mena:
Bishop Antonio de Isla y Mena (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 9.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 300
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,150
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 209, Number 1,303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013