Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Salentin von Isenburg

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532Born
23 Dec 156735.9SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 Dec 157341.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Apr 157442.3SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
14 Sep 157442.7ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Sep 157745.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Paderborn, Germany
13 Sep 157745.6ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Mar 161078.2DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Salentin von Isenburg
Father Salentin von Isenburg (born 1532, died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172, and Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast