Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan I˝iguez Arnedo

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648²BornBergara
10 May 170052.3AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
20 Jun 170052.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
14 Feb 171062.1DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan I˝iguez Arnedo:
Bishop Juan I˝iguez Arnedo (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,744
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 8
  • d: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1700, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015