Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Bustos de la Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1647BornMadrid
30 Mar 170052.4AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
20 Jun 170052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
30 Jul 171062.7DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Lucas Bustos de la Torre:
Bishop Lucas Bustos de la Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 7
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015